Trustees THE NATIONAL GARDEN SCHEME

Charity number: 1112664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rupert David Tyler Chair 18 November 2020
None on record
Arit Anderson Trustee 17 March 2021
None on record
Vernon Sanderson Trustee 23 March 2020
None on record
Susan Anne Paynton Trustee 20 November 2019
None on record
Richard Barley Trustee 08 October 2019
THE KEW GUILD
Received: On time
Alison Wright Trustee 23 January 2019
RAMPISHAM AND WRAXALL VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Atty Beor-Roberts Trustee 25 September 2018
None on record
MAUREEN KESTEVEN Trustee 22 November 2017
MAJI SALAMA
Received: On time
MARK PORTER Trustee 13 March 2017
THE ROYAL HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Andrew Ratcliffe Trustee 01 April 2015
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF MUSIC
Received: On time
Susan Margaret Copeland Trustee 01 November 2014
None on record
Richard Paul Hepworth Thompson Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
PETER CLAY Trustee 03 November 2011
None on record
SUSAN PHIPPS Trustee 23 May 2011
None on record