Accounts and annual returns ESSEX COUPLE ADVICE

Charity number: 1113609
Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 95 days
Annual return 13 May 2022 Overdue Overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2022 Overdue Overdue by 461 days
Annual return 13 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 826 days
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 826 days
Annual return 13 May 2020 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 13 May 2019 05 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 May 2019 Not Required