AL MUSTAFA WELFARE TRUST INTERNATIONAL LTD

Charity number: 1118492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £711.36k £996.59k £1.40m £1.97m £4.39m
Total expenditure £655.83k £959.41k £1.39m £1.93m £3.25m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £711.30k £996.58k £1.40m £1.97m £4.39m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54 £10 £58 £252 £158
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £586.98k £868.17k £1.26m £1.73m £2.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £68.85k £91.24k £133.67k £202.05k £554.14k
Expenditure - Governance £28.61k £35.30k £56.65k £59.22k £51.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0