Financial history KENT MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1117731
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £244.11k £294.17k £407.61k £357.16k £59.20k
Total expenditure £169.05k £613.79k £438.51k £267.76k £38.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A