Accounts and annual returns KENT MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1117731
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 February 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 February 2022 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 February 2019 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 February 2019 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window