THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH HEDGERLEY

Charity number: 1113200
Charity reporting is overdue by 1817 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 722 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 722 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1087 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1087 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1452 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1452 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1817 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1817 days