OXFORD AFRICAN REFUGEES AND FAMILIES DEVELOPMENT COMMUNITY (OARFDC)

Charity number: 1115456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 December 2019 04 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2018 22 December 2019 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2017 30 September 2018 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2016 26 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2015 04 November 2016 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2015 Not Required