OXFORD AFRICAN REFUGEES AND FAMILIES DEVELOPMENT COMMUNITY (OARFDC)

Charity number: 1115456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 20/11/2015 20/11/2016 20/11/2017 20/11/2018 22/12/2019
Total gross income £2.50k £4.66k £4.65k £2.25k £2.16k
Total expenditure £2.25k £4.54k £4.58k £2.15k £2.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A