WYTHENSHAWE COMMUNITY INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1112990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £94.19k £65.75k £77.74k £104.81k £82.02k
Total expenditure £93.54k £96.90k £88.43k £95.57k £107.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £62.47k £49.71k £23.98k £32.60k £28.03k