Financial history LIFECARE UK

Charity number: 1113964
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £9.45k £2.09k £983 £23.75k £240
Total expenditure £9.90k £2.29k £272 £15.44k £266
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A