Financial history WAVE ACTIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1113486
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.46m £5.53m £7.40m £4.83m £5.18m
Total expenditure £5.34m £5.92m £7.74m £4.95m £5.35m
Income from government contracts £417.55k £313.10k £6.22m £648.70k £566.20k
Income from government grants £55.00k £76.01k £460.00k £1.66m £462.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.88m £211.05k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.46m £5.53m £7.40m £2.94m £4.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.12k £2.74k £3.48k £3.93k £204
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.34m £5.92m £7.74m £4.95m £5.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £18.41k
Expenditure - Governance £7.65k £0 £15.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0