Trustees WAVE ACTIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1113486
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ERIC KIHLSTROM Chair 04 April 2022
None on record
Cllr Johnny Denis Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
Cllr Laurence O'Connor Trustee 24 July 2020
None on record
KEVIN DAVID ELLIS Trustee 30 July 2018
None on record
Marcel Philippe Miller Trustee 22 February 2018
None on record
Philip James Clarke Trustee 25 February 2016
None on record
Mike Price Trustee 16 July 2015
None on record
Mark Beaumont Trustee 16 July 2015
None on record