THE FRIENDS OF SAINT MARY MAGDALENE'S CHURCH SUNDERLAND

Charity number: 1113342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.44k £6.18k £4.23k £5.33k £2.20k
Total expenditure £4.62k £5.60k £5.16k £4.59k £3.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A