AFRICAN FUTURE DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1115026
Charity reporting is overdue by 300 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £104.54k £167.50k £207.57k £266.33k £171.96k
Total expenditure £88.44k £147.67k £242.14k £227.76k £191.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A