Trustees COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION FOR MINORITY COMMUNITIES LTD

Charity number: 1114410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hussein Ali Ahmed Chair 02 February 2018
None on record
Muna Noor Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
Benti Mohamed Ahmed Trustee 15 July 2020
None on record
Kassim Bana Mohamed Trustee 03 July 2015
None on record
Abubakar Sheikh Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record