Financial history Amin Welfare Foundation

Charity number: 1113372
Charity reporting is overdue by 617 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/12/2016 14/12/2017 14/12/2018 14/12/2019 14/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A