Financial history THE JOHN FAWCETT FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1115274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £56.39k £91.66k £36.72k £40.10k £61.38k
Total expenditure £50.45k £89.64k £41.70k £41.97k £62.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A