Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN FAWCETT FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1115274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 March 2017 On time Download Open in new window