Financial history GABRIELI

Charity number: 1114146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.01m £688.11k £1.02m £777.19k £279.96k
Total expenditure £1.06m £664.30k £1.02m £781.59k £228.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.22k £10.00k £25.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £197.30k £102.85k £371.12k £114.32k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £817.26k £585.26k £647.00k £662.87k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £634.94k £988.60k £746.78k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.12k £29.36k £34.16k £34.81k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k £0 £1.95k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A