Accounts and annual returns BUILD UP ST ANTHONY'S MALAWI

Charity number: 1117016
Charity reporting is overdue by 986 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 256 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 256 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 Overdue Overdue by 621 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Overdue Overdue by 621 days
Annual return 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 986 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 986 days
Annual return 30 November 2019 27 May 2021 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 27 May 2021 605 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required