Financial history BUILD UP ST ANTHONY'S MALAWI

Charity number: 1117016
Charity reporting is overdue by 997 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2012 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £1.17k £260 £199 £197 £2.76k
Total expenditure £381 £306 £306 £336 £336
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A