Financial history A LEG TO STAND ON

Charity number: 1118048
Charity reporting is overdue by 1029 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £39 £35 £25 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.00k £219 £1.22k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A