CAMEROONIAN ACTION FOR AIDS, WELFARE AND RETURN HOME

Charity number: 1115448
Charity reporting is overdue by 971 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 606 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 606 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 971 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 971 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 April 2019 453 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 April 2019 453 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 August 2017 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required