CAMEROONIAN ACTION FOR AIDS, WELFARE AND RETURN HOME

Charity number: 1115448
Charity reporting is overdue by 969 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £52.65k £56.31k £16.70k £24.60k £28.37k
Total expenditure £55.83k £60.85k £16.40k £24.12k £28.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0