THE LIVERPOOL ACADEMY OF ARTS

Charity number: 1114232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £817 £750 £378
Total expenditure £1.25k £0 £478 £315 £598
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A