Accounts and annual returns PARS COMMUNITY ACTION IN THE UK

Charity number: 1122409
Charity reporting is overdue by 163 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 163 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 163 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 May 2023 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 September 2021 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 May 2020 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required