SWEISSY UNION

Charity number: 1125890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2019 12 May 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2018 28 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2016 27 March 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2016 Not Required