SWEISSY UNION

Charity number: 1125890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/04/2016 28/04/2017 28/04/2018 28/04/2019 28/04/2020
Total gross income £3.90k £6.50k £5.84k £4.55k £4.72k
Total expenditure £1.20k £5.60k £1.80k £180 £180
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A