Financial history North London Adult Care Ltd

Charity number: 1115319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.28m £1.26m £1.24m £857.11k £798.20k
Total expenditure £1.19m £1.25m £1.32m £952.32k £796.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £49.71k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.28m £1.25m £1.24m £857.11k £798.20k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.47k £0 £0 £0 £51
Income - Other £0 £1.70k £1.97k £34.77k £49.71k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.19m £1.23m £1.32m £952.32k £796.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £6.00k £14.69k £22.25k £13.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £20.73k £0 £0 £0