Accounts and annual returns ARCHITECTURE FOR HUMANITY (UK) LTD

Charity number: 1115668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 02 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 14 January 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 January 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 30 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required