CHURCHILL COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £20.49m £20.04m £22.30m £23.57m £22.45m
Total expenditure £18.87m £20.55m £20.39m £22.35m £21.77m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.64m £1.32m £3.62m £3.05m £3.42m
Income - Other trading activities £6.34m £6.55m £6.36m £6.63m £5.62m
Income - Charitable activities £9.24m £10.66m £11.22m £12.16m £11.54m
Income - Endowments £702.00k £427.00k £1.01m £1.49m £593.00k
Income - Investment £1.98m £1.93m £2.11m £1.73m £1.87m
Income - Other £4.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.42m £12.41m £11.54m £21.05m £20.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.46m £7.54m £7.92m £492.00k £566.00k
Expenditure - Governance £33.00k £36.00k £33.00k £42.00k £38.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.30k £142.00k £109.00k £69.00k £71.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £599.00k £927.00k £803.00k £803.00k