CHURCHILL COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dame Athene Donald Chair 01 October 2014
THE SIR WINSTON CHURCHILL ARCHIVE TRUST Received: On time
THE MARGARET THATCHER ARCHIVE TRUST Received: On time
CHURCHILL COLLEGE ARCHIVES TRUST Received: On time
Amy Rees Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Tamsin James Trustee 20 February 2017
THE CHURCHILL COLLEGE CHAPEL SOCIETY TRUST Received: On time
ROLLO DAVIDSON TRUST FUND Received: On time
Tess Kilburn Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Dr Mark Holmes Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
Dr Seb Savory Trustee 19 September 2016 None on record
Dr Alice Reid Trustee 06 January 2019
POPULATION INVESTIGATION COMMITTEE Received: On time
Dr JEREMY TONER Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Emma Davis Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
Barry Phipps Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
Samuel Turner Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
Dr Michelle Linterman Trustee 06 January 2019 None on record
Dr Rita Monson Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Rebecca Cresswell Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Elizabeth DeMarrais Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
Professor Matthew Kramer FBA Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Rebecca Heath Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
Dr Lisa Jardine-Wright Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Professor Andrew Webber Trustee 09 July 2019 None on record