Financial history CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST HOREB OF GOD PARISH

Charity number: 1115753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £60.79k £89.55k £59.52k £73.66k £73.01k
Total expenditure £77.07k £85.26k £71.91k £73.68k £55.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k