Financial history THE PIOTR MACIEJ & HENRYKA MARIA KOZLOWSKI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £67.16k £26.03k £19.55k £5.35k £110.03k
Total expenditure £67.57k £64.44k £28.19k £100.46k £21.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A