Financial history CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST AYOMIDE PARISH

Charity number: 1115765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £58.83k £30.81k £20.68k £36.95k £35.12k
Total expenditure £42.45k £28.16k £32.60k £45.02k £37.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A