Financial history MIDLAND DOCTORS ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1114559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £393.66k £502.73k £468.06k £686.81k £530.74k
Total expenditure £333.16k £367.75k £566.24k £495.91k £556.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £502.18k N/A £684.34k £529.83k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £437 N/A £2.42k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £912
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £111 N/A £44 £4
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £335.81k N/A £441.05k £541.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £30.60k N/A £54.86k £15.60k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £0 £25.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £10.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £1.34k N/A £0 £0