Financial history HOLY GHOST ZONE LONDON

Charity number: 1115001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £300.02k £337.42k £303.70k £317.29k £230.09k
Total expenditure £276.66k £324.96k £272.70k £281.58k £241.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A