THE BRAIN CHARITY

Charity number: 1114999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £641.18k £663.40k £706.46k £855.01k £808.72k
Total expenditure £653.19k £710.00k £731.20k £837.26k £860.92k
Income from government contracts £99.60k £101.00k £95.97k £94.00k £90.79k
Income from government grants £0 £56.00k N/A N/A £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £73.96k £76.07k £66.98k £70.42k £52.29k
Income - Other trading activities £402.83k £302.16k £323.56k £359.58k £0
Income - Charitable activities £154.08k £275.09k £305.08k £414.81k £402.53k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.30k £10.08k £10.85k £10.20k £9.20k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £344.70k
Income - Legacies £0 £5.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £495.89k £557.88k £558.78k £568.97k £615.24k
Expenditure - Raising funds £157.30k £15.28k £172.42k £268.28k £245.68k
Expenditure - Governance £10.45k £0 £0 £0 £5.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £4.54k £2.13k £1.61k
Expenditure - Other £0 £136.84k £0 £0 £0