THE BRAIN CHARITY

Charity number: 1114999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Blomley Trustee 19 October 2021
THE JD FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr NICHOLAS SILVER Trustee 08 January 2018
CLAIRE WAND FUND Overdue by 28 days
Dr Perry Moore Trustee 19 October 2021 None on record
Ian Craig Trustee 02 April 2020
WILLOWBROOK HOSPICE Received: On time
Timothy G Walsh Trustee 08 May 2017 None on record
Karen Elizabeth Swan Trustee 30 November 2016 None on record
Dr John Picton Trustee 05 July 2018 None on record
MARK REA Trustee 30 January 2013 None on record
Jacqueline Sale Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR WILLIAM CHAMBERS Chair 07 October 2015 None on record
Vanessa Boateng Trustee 19 October 2021
NEW ERA INITIATIVE Received: On time