Accounts and annual returns THE CARL CHAPMAN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1115409
Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required