AR RAHMAH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1115618
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £57.90k £51.51k £50.45k £87.22k £61.57k
Total expenditure £45.11k £53.99k £45.96k £85.89k £68.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A