FRIENDS OF STEYNING GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1115430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 July 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required