FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS' GREAT CORNARD

Charity number: 1117176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 November 2020 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required