FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS' GREAT CORNARD

Charity number: 1117176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £8.30k £3.86k £1.14k £226 £40
Total expenditure £18.23k £16.50k £4.99k £77 £4.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A