Accounts and annual returns ASPIRE COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE (SHEFFIELD) LTD

Charity number: 1116421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 March 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 March 2020 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 July 2019 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 July 2019 152 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window