Financial history NORTH YORKSHIRE YOUTH LIMITED

Charity number: 1116521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £998.58k £934.83k £1.17m £1.12m £823.78k
Total expenditure £891.97k £958.59k £1.05m £1.06m £788.09k
Income from government contracts £322.83k £375.76k £362.38k £332.58k £303.37k
Income from government grants £0 N/A £9.08k £10.73k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.07k £14.13k £10.30k £0 £998
Income - Other trading activities £608.48k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £377.02k £544.93k £1.16m £1.12m £629.12k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £375.76k £0 £0 £193.66k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £998
Expenditure - Charitable activities £891.97k £575.93k £1.05m £1.06m £788.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £3.36k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £382.66k £0 £0 £0