Accounts and annual returns NORTH YORKSHIRE YOUTH LIMITED

Charity number: 1116521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window