Financial history VISION INDIA

Charity number: 1116412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/10/2017 16/10/2018 16/10/2019 16/10/2020 16/10/2021
Total gross income £0 £100 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A