Accounts and annual returns OMAR FARUQUE MOSQUE AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1117040
Charity reporting is overdue by 1717 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 256 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 256 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 621 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 621 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 986 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 986 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1351 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1351 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1717 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1717 days