Financial history OMAR FARUQUE MOSQUE AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1117040
Charity reporting is overdue by 1725 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £21.82k £22.52k £22.46k £17.88k £24.15k
Total expenditure £30.08k £18.07k £20.59k £23.41k £23.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A